Show Posts

This section allows you to view all posts made by this member. Note that you can only see posts made in areas you currently have access to.


Messages - Anuz

Pages: 1 ... 114 115 [116] 117 118 119
1726
Wow........... Really a nice and Beautiful Bird with several colours. Thanks.........fot the post.

1727
Hinduism / Re: The Story of Savitri & Satyavan
« on: March 06, 2013, 02:33:07 PM »
Dada, Nice Post. After a long time I read the story and enjoy it.

1728
Nutrition and Food Engineering / Re: carrot-Nutritional Benefits
« on: June 07, 2012, 08:20:50 AM »
Informative post.
Thanks mam.

1729
Faculty Forum / Re: At a Glance-The Best Measure of Center
« on: June 04, 2012, 01:53:54 PM »
I am also confused.
But I think Mean is the best measure of center.

1730
Informative post, thanks for sharing Narayan Sir.

1731
Faculty Forum / Re: Improve Your Basic Mathematics
« on: June 04, 2012, 01:45:45 PM »
Nice Topic and i think Tips-3 is more effective.
Thanks BCD sir.

1732
Nice Topic.  and nice Tips.

1733
Common Forum/Request/Suggestions / Re: Upgraded Forum Contents
« on: June 04, 2012, 01:35:51 PM »
Yes, its really nice and good looking.


1734
Thanks for sharing.
                               Sir

1735
Science Discussion Forum / Re: Limit ur salt intake-Its high time
« on: May 02, 2012, 10:10:34 AM »
Very informative post. Thanks for sharing the post. I am always trying to follow it.

1736
Sir,
      Thanks for sharing.

1737
Common Forum / Math Magic
« on: April 28, 2012, 06:00:55 PM »
                                                 Trick 1: Number below 10
Step1: Think of a number below 10.
Step2: Double the number you have thought.
Step3: Add 6 with the getting result.
Step4: Half the answer, that is divide it by 2.
Step5: Take away the number you have thought from the answer, that is, subtract the answer from the number you have thought.
                                                                                                                                 Answer: 3

                                                   Trick 2: Any Number
Step1: Think of any number.
Step2: Subtract the number you have thought with 1.
Step3: Multiply the result with 3.
Step4: Add 12 with the result.
Step5: Divide the answer by 3.
Step6: Add 5 with the answer.
Step7: Take away the number you have thought from the answer, that is, subtract the answer from the number you have thought.
                                                                                                                                 Answer: 8

                                                      Trick 3: Any Number
Step1: Think of any number.
Step2: Multiply the number you have thought with 3.
Step3: Add 45 with the result.
Step4: Double the result.
Step5: Divide the answer by 6.
Step6: Take away the number you have thought from the answer, that is, subtract the answer from the number you have thought.
                                                                                                                                Answer: 15

                                                      Trick 4: Same 3 Digit Number
Step1: Think of any 3 digit number, but each of the digits must be the same as. Ex: 333, 666.
Step2: Add up the digits.
Step3: Divide the 3 digit number with the digits added up.
                                                                                                                               Answer: 37

                                                  Trick 5: 2 Single Digit Numbers
Step1: Think of 2 single digit numbers.
Step2: Take any one of the number among them and double it.
Step3: Add 5 with the result.
Step4: Multiply the result with 5.
Step5: Add the second number to the answer.
Step6: Subtract the answer with 4.
Step7: Subtract the answer again with 21.
                                                                                                    Answer: 2 Single Digit Numbers.

                                                   Trick 6: 1, 2, 4, 5, 7, 8
Step1: Choose a number from 1 to 6.
Step2: Multiply the number with 9.
Step3: Multiply the result with 111.
Step4: Multiply the result by 1001.
Step5: Divide the answer by 7.
                                                                                Answer: All the above numbers will be present.

                                                     Trick 7: 1089
Step1: Think of a 3 digit number.
Step2: Arrange the number in descending order.
Step3: Reverse the number and subtract it with the result.
Step4: Remember it and reverse the answer mentally.
Step5: Add it with the result, you have got.
                                                                                                                            Answer: 1089
                                                    Trick 8: x7x11x13
Step1: Think of a 3 digit number.
Step2: Multiply it with x7x11x13.
Ex: Number: 456,                                                                                                  Answer: 456456

                                                    Trick 9: x3x7x13x37
Step1: Think of a 2 digit number.
Step2: Multiply it with x3x7x13x37.
Ex: Number: 45,                                                                                                    Answer: 454545
                                                     
                                                    Trick 10: 9091
Step1:Think of a 5 digit number.
Step2:Multiply it with 11.
Step3:Multiply it with 9091.
Ex: Number: 12345,                                                                                          Answer:1234512345

1738
Faculty Forum / Beauty of Mathematics
« on: April 28, 2012, 05:11:10 PM »
                                               Sequential Inputs of numbers with 8
                                                            1 x 8 + 1 = 9
                                                          12 x 8 + 2 = 98
                                                        123 x 8 + 3 = 987
                                                      1234 x 8 + 4 = 9876
                                                    12345 x 8 + 5 = 98765
                                                  123456 x 8 + 6 = 987654
                                                1234567 x 8 + 7 = 9876543
                                              12345678 x 8 + 8 = 98765432
                                            123456789 x 8 + 9 = 987654321
...


                                                      Sequential 1's with 9
                                                           1 x 9 + 2 = 11
                                                         12 x 9 + 3 = 111
                                                       123 x 9 + 4 = 1111
                                                     1234 x 9 + 5 = 11111
                                                   12345 x 9 + 6 = 111111
                                                 123456 x 9 + 7 = 1111111
                                               1234567 x 9 + 8 = 11111111
                                             12345678 x 9 + 9 = 111111111
                                           123456789 x 9 + 10 = 1111111111
...


                                                   Sequential 8's with 9
                                                       9 x 9 + 7 = 88
                                                     98 x 9 + 6 = 888
                                                   987 x 9 + 5 = 8888
                                                 9876 x 9 + 4 = 88888
                                               98765 x 9 + 3 = 888888
                                             987654 x 9 + 2 = 8888888
                                           9876543 x 9 + 1 = 88888888
                                         98765432 x 9 + 0 = 888888888
...


                                           Numeric Palindrome with 1's
                                                         1 x 1 = 1
                                                       11 x 11 = 121
                                                     111 x 111 = 12321
                                                   1111 x 1111 = 1234321
                                                 11111 x 11111 = 123454321
                                               111111 x 111111 = 12345654321
                                             1111111 x 1111111 = 1234567654321
                                           11111111 x 11111111 = 123456787654321
                                         111111111 x 111111111 = 12345678987654321
...


                                                                  Without 8
                                                        12345679 x 9 = 111111111
                                                        12345679 x 18 = 222222222
                                                        12345679 x 27 = 333333333
                                                        12345679 x 36 = 444444444
                                                        12345679 x 45 = 555555555
                                                        12345679 x 54 = 666666666
                                                        12345679 x 63 = 777777777
                                                        12345679 x 72 = 888888888
                                                        12345679 x 81 = 999999999
...


                                                     Sequential Inputs of 9
                                                            9 x 9 = 81
                                                          99 x 99 = 9801
                                                        999 x 999 = 998001
                                                      9999 x 9999 = 99980001
                                                    99999 x 99999 = 9999800001
                                                  999999 x 999999 = 999998000001
                                                9999999 x 9999999 = 99999980000001
                                              99999999 x 99999999 = 9999999800000001
                                            999999999 x 999999999 = 999999998000000001
...


                                                       Sequential Inputs of 6
                                                                6 x 7 = 42
                                                              66 x 67 = 4422
                                                            666 x 667 = 444222
                                                          6666 x 6667 = 44442222
                                                        66666 x 66667 = 4444422222
                                                      666666 x 666667 = 444444222222
                                                    6666666 x 6666667 = 44444442222222
                                                  66666666 x 66666667 = 4444444422222222
                                                666666666 x 666666667 = 444444444222222222
...

1739
Common Forum / Birthday Date Calcualtions
« on: April 28, 2012, 11:09:25 AM »
Here you can find your birthday using some tricks. You can play these trick as instructed, with your parents or friends and prove your talent to them.

Birthday Calculation Tricks:

Step1: Add 18 to your birth month.
Step2: Multiply by 25.
Step3: Subtract 333.
Step4: Multiply by 8.
step5: Subtract 554.
step6: Divide by 2.
step7: Add your birth date.
step8: Multiply by 5.
step9: Add 692.
step10: Multiply by 20.
step11: Add only the last two digits of your birth year.
step12: Subtract 32940 to get your birthday.

Example: If the answer is 123199 means that you were born on December 31, 1999. If the answer is not right, you followed the directions incorrectly or lied about your birthday.

1740
Common Forum / Age Calculation
« on: April 28, 2012, 11:04:31 AM »
Here you can find the age using some tricks. You can play these trick as instructed, with your parents or friends and prove your talent to them.

Age Calculation Tricks:

Step1: Multiply the first number of the age by 5. (If <10, ex 5, consider it as 05. If it is >100, ex: 102, then take 10 as the first digit, 2 as the second one.)

Step2: Add 3 to the result.

Step3: Double the answer.

Step4: Add the second digit of the number with the result.

Step5: Subtract 6 from it.


Pages: 1 ... 114 115 [116] 117 118 119