676

**Common Forum / Math Magic**

« **on:**April 28, 2012, 06:00:55 PM »

Trick 1: Number below 10

Step1: Think of a number below 10.

Step2: Double the number you have thought.

Step3: Add 6 with the getting result.

Step4: Half the answer, that is divide it by 2.

Step5: Take away the number you have thought from the answer, that is, subtract the answer from the number you have thought.

Answer: 3

Trick 2: Any Number

Step1: Think of any number.

Step2: Subtract the number you have thought with 1.

Step3: Multiply the result with 3.

Step4: Add 12 with the result.

Step5: Divide the answer by 3.

Step6: Add 5 with the answer.

Step7: Take away the number you have thought from the answer, that is, subtract the answer from the number you have thought.

Answer: 8

Trick 3: Any Number

Step1: Think of any number.

Step2: Multiply the number you have thought with 3.

Step3: Add 45 with the result.

Step4: Double the result.

Step5: Divide the answer by 6.

Step6: Take away the number you have thought from the answer, that is, subtract the answer from the number you have thought.

Answer: 15

Trick 4: Same 3 Digit Number

Step1: Think of any 3 digit number, but each of the digits must be the same as. Ex: 333, 666.

Step2: Add up the digits.

Step3: Divide the 3 digit number with the digits added up.

Answer: 37

Trick 5: 2 Single Digit Numbers

Step1: Think of 2 single digit numbers.

Step2: Take any one of the number among them and double it.

Step3: Add 5 with the result.

Step4: Multiply the result with 5.

Step5: Add the second number to the answer.

Step6: Subtract the answer with 4.

Step7: Subtract the answer again with 21.

Answer: 2 Single Digit Numbers.

Trick 6: 1, 2, 4, 5, 7, 8

Step1: Choose a number from 1 to 6.

Step2: Multiply the number with 9.

Step3: Multiply the result with 111.

Step4: Multiply the result by 1001.

Step5: Divide the answer by 7.

Answer: All the above numbers will be present.

Trick 7: 1089

Step1: Think of a 3 digit number.

Step2: Arrange the number in descending order.

Step3: Reverse the number and subtract it with the result.

Step4: Remember it and reverse the answer mentally.

Step5: Add it with the result, you have got.

Answer: 1089

Trick 8: x7x11x13

Step1: Think of a 3 digit number.

Step2: Multiply it with x7x11x13.

Ex: Number: 456, Answer: 456456

Trick 9: x3x7x13x37

Step1: Think of a 2 digit number.

Step2: Multiply it with x3x7x13x37.

Ex: Number: 45, Answer: 454545

Trick 10: 9091

Step1:Think of a 5 digit number.

Step2:Multiply it with 11.

Step3:Multiply it with 9091.

Ex: Number: 12345, Answer:1234512345

Step1: Think of a number below 10.

Step2: Double the number you have thought.

Step3: Add 6 with the getting result.

Step4: Half the answer, that is divide it by 2.

Step5: Take away the number you have thought from the answer, that is, subtract the answer from the number you have thought.

Answer: 3

Trick 2: Any Number

Step1: Think of any number.

Step2: Subtract the number you have thought with 1.

Step3: Multiply the result with 3.

Step4: Add 12 with the result.

Step5: Divide the answer by 3.

Step6: Add 5 with the answer.

Step7: Take away the number you have thought from the answer, that is, subtract the answer from the number you have thought.

Answer: 8

Trick 3: Any Number

Step1: Think of any number.

Step2: Multiply the number you have thought with 3.

Step3: Add 45 with the result.

Step4: Double the result.

Step5: Divide the answer by 6.

Step6: Take away the number you have thought from the answer, that is, subtract the answer from the number you have thought.

Answer: 15

Trick 4: Same 3 Digit Number

Step1: Think of any 3 digit number, but each of the digits must be the same as. Ex: 333, 666.

Step2: Add up the digits.

Step3: Divide the 3 digit number with the digits added up.

Answer: 37

Trick 5: 2 Single Digit Numbers

Step1: Think of 2 single digit numbers.

Step2: Take any one of the number among them and double it.

Step3: Add 5 with the result.

Step4: Multiply the result with 5.

Step5: Add the second number to the answer.

Step6: Subtract the answer with 4.

Step7: Subtract the answer again with 21.

Answer: 2 Single Digit Numbers.

Trick 6: 1, 2, 4, 5, 7, 8

Step1: Choose a number from 1 to 6.

Step2: Multiply the number with 9.

Step3: Multiply the result with 111.

Step4: Multiply the result by 1001.

Step5: Divide the answer by 7.

Answer: All the above numbers will be present.

Trick 7: 1089

Step1: Think of a 3 digit number.

Step2: Arrange the number in descending order.

Step3: Reverse the number and subtract it with the result.

Step4: Remember it and reverse the answer mentally.

Step5: Add it with the result, you have got.

Answer: 1089

Trick 8: x7x11x13

Step1: Think of a 3 digit number.

Step2: Multiply it with x7x11x13.

Ex: Number: 456, Answer: 456456

Trick 9: x3x7x13x37

Step1: Think of a 2 digit number.

Step2: Multiply it with x3x7x13x37.

Ex: Number: 45, Answer: 454545

Trick 10: 9091

Step1:Think of a 5 digit number.

Step2:Multiply it with 11.

Step3:Multiply it with 9091.

Ex: Number: 12345, Answer:1234512345